RI S2004 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the manufacturing, importation, sale, shipment, delivery, possession, or transfer of any firearm that is undetectable by metal detectors commonly used at airports and public buildings including 3D printed firearms as defined herein.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Passage *************************** (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Approval of amendment (Y: 8 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-23HouseSigned by Governor
2020-06-17HouseTransmitted to Governor
2020-06-17SenateSenate passed Sub B in concurrence
2020-06-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/17/2020)
2020-03-12HouseHouse passed Sub B
2020-03-10HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/12/2020)
2020-03-10HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2020-03-09HouseProposed Substitute
2020-03-06HouseScheduled for consideration (03/10/2020)
2020-03-03HouseMeeting postponed (03/03/2020)
2020-03-03HouseMeeting postponed (03/03/2020)
2020-02-28HouseProposed Substitute
2020-02-28HouseScheduled for consideration
2020-02-27HouseHouse voted to recommit to House Judiciary
2020-02-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (02/27/2020)
2020-02-25HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2020-02-21HouseProposed Substitute
2020-02-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2020)
2020-01-30HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2020-01-29SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2020-01-22SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (01/29/2020)
2020-01-21SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2020-01-17SenateProposed Substitute
2020-01-17SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2020)
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback