RI S2271 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- HOTELS - Extends the current provisions relative to certain rights of innkeepers and eliminates the sunsetting of such sections thereby preserving the law as it currently exists.
Title
Extends the current provisions relative to certain rights of innkeepers and eliminates the sunsetting of such sections thereby preserving the law as it currently exists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2024) |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |