RI S2417 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2024)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 2 Senate Judiciary Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2024)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 2 Senate Judiciary Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- RESIDENTIAL LANDLORD AND TENANT ACT - Creates a tenant bill of rights to the right to counsel, the right to habitability, the right to organize free, the right to be free from discrimination, the right to first refusal if the landlord decides to sell the property, and right to renew lease.
Title
Creates a tenant bill of rights to the right to counsel, the right to habitability, the right to organize free, the right to be free from discrimination, the right to first refusal if the landlord decides to sell the property, and right to renew lease.
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Victoria Gu [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2024) |
2024-03-16 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/19/2024) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2417.pdf |