RI S2459 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HUMAN SERVICES -- THE RHODE ISLAND WORKS PROGRAM - Removes the requirement that families consent to, and cooperate with the department of human services in establishing paternity and enforcing child and medical support orders as a condition of eligibility for childcare assistance.
Title
Removes the requirement that families consent to, and cooperate with the department of human services in establishing paternity and enforcing child and medical support orders as a condition of eligibility for childcare assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2024) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2459.pdf |