RI S2716 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PRIMARY CARE TRAINING SITES PROGRAM - Establishes the primary care training sites program and appropriates $2,700,000 for implementing the program.
Title
Establishes the primary care training sites program and appropriates $2,700,000 for implementing the program.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2716.pdf |