RI S2717 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- THE MEDICAL PRIMARY CARE SCHOLARSHIP PROGRAM - Establishes the medical primary care scholarship program to be administered by the commissioner of postsecondary education.
Title
Establishes the medical primary care scholarship program to be administered by the commissioner of postsecondary education.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2717.pdf |