RI S2719 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Committee recommends passage
Hearing: May 14 Senate Health and Human Services Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Committee recommends passage
Hearing: May 14 Senate Health and Human Services Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- RHODE ISLAND DRUG COST REVIEW COMMISSION - Creates the Rhode Island drug cost review commission.
Title
Creates the Rhode Island drug cost review commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2024) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2719.pdf |