RI S2805 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INCORPORATING THE RHODE ISLAND COMMISSION FOR NATIONAL AND COMMUNITY SERVICE - Reduces the number of commissioners on the board of commissioners to no less than fifteen and would add a d/b/a Serve RI designation after commissions name.
Title
Reduces the number of commissioners on the board of commissioners to no less than fifteen and would add a d/b/a Serve RI designation after commissions name.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2805.pdf |