RI S2833 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS -- DOMESTIC ASSAULT - Provides that effective July 1, 2025, any attorney who self-certifies that they have successfully completed a specialized domestic violence prosecution training course shall have the authority to prosecute any violation of a protective order.
Title
Provides that effective July 1, 2025, any attorney who self-certifies that they have successfully completed a specialized domestic violence prosecution training course shall have the authority to prosecute any violation of a protective order.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts And Civil Procedure
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS -- DOMESTIC ASSAULT
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS -- DOMESTIC ASSAULT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2833.pdf |