SC H3072 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 12-43-220, Relating To Assessment Ratios, So As To Provide That Under Certain Circumstances, Property Receiving The Four Percent Assessment Ratio Shall Continue At Four Percent When The Owner Dies.
Title
Assessment ratios
Sponsors
Rep. William Hewitt [R] | Rep. John Mccravy [R] | Rep. James Burns [R] | Rep. Jordan Pace [R] |
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. JA Moore [D] | Rep. Micajah Caskey [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-05-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2023-05-10 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-10 | House | Amended |
2023-05-09 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2023-05-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2023-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.Moore |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |