SC H3114 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 41-10-35 So As To Provide That The Minimum Wage In This State Is The Greater Value Of Either Ten Dollars And Ten Cents Or The Minimum Wage Set By The Fair Labor Standards Act; To Amend Section 6-1-130, Relating To The Scope Of Authority To Set Minimum Wage, So As To Provide That A Political Subdivision Of This State May Not Require A Minimum Wage That Exceeds The One Provided In Section 41-10-35; To Amend Section 44-22-160, Relating To Therapeutic Patient Employment, So As To Provide That A Patient Employee Must Be Paid The Minimum Wage Provided In Section 41-10-35; And To Amend Sections 53-1-100 And 53-1-110, Relating To Sunday Work In Machine Shops And Sunday Work In Manufacturing Or Finishing Of Textile Products, Respectively, Both So As To Provide That Sunday Work Must Be Compensated At A Rate No Less Than The Minimum Wage Provided In Section 41-10-35.
Title
Minimum wage
Sponsors
Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. Shedron Williams [D] | Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] |
Rep. Krystle Matthews [D] | Rep. Rosalyn Henderson-Myers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers |
2019-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Simmons |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3217 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
H3467 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
H3467 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 10 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 22 | 160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3114&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3114_20181218.htm |