SC H3250 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 43-5-250 So As To Establish The "fruit And Vegetable Snap Grant Program" To Encourage Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (snap) Recipients To Purchase More Fresh Fruits And Vegetables By Providing Them With A Certain Additional Allotment, To Establish The Fruit And Vegetable Snap Grant Fund, And To Provide That The Department Of Social Services Shall Coordinate With Local Grocery Stores And Farmers' Markets To Develop Certain Plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fruit and Vegetable SNAP Grant Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson
2020-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis
2019-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
435250(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback