SC H3895 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 45-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten, West, Hartnett, B.Newton, S.Jones, Hager, Bustos, Gibson, Neese, M.M.Smith, Gatch, Hewitt
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten, West, Hartnett, B.Newton, S.Jones, Hager, Bustos, Gibson, Neese, M.M.Smith, Gatch, Hewitt
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Make Application By The State Of South Carolina Under Article V Of The United States Constitution For A Convention Of The States To Be Called, Restricted To Proposing An Amendment To The United States Constitution To Set A Limit On The Number Of Terms That A Person May Be Elected As A Member Of The United States House Of Representatives, And To Set A Limit On The Number Of Terms That A Person May Be Elected As A Member Of The United States Senate.
Title
Convention of the States
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten, West, Hartnett, B.Newton, S.Jones, Hager, Bustos, Gibson, Neese, M.M.Smith, Gatch, Hewitt |
2024-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Schuessler |
2024-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, T.A.Morgan, Hixon, Mitchell, Yow |
2024-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Vaughan, Hyde |
2024-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Oremus, Blackwell, Guffey, Jefferson, Leber, May, Willis, Guest, Williams, Haddon, White, Brittain, T.Moore, Kilmartin |
2024-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton, Lowe, Jordan |
2024-01-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith |
2023-04-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cromer |
2023-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2023-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.J.Cox, A.M.Morgan |
2023-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: O'Neal, J.L.Johnson |
2023-03-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2023-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3895&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3895_20230207.htm |