SC H3927 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Act No. 186
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Act No. 186
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Department Of Motor Vehicles May Issue "chase Away Childhood Cancer" Special License Plates
Title
License plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Act No. 186 | |
2016-05-27 | Effective date 05/25/17 | |
2016-05-25 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-05-24 | Ratified R 201 | |
2016-05-19 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2016-05-19 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-05-18 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-18-16 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Amended |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2015-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-55 Nays-43 |
2015-04-28 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-28 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 3 | 10610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 10710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 2250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7360 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |