SC H4113 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Article 9 To Chapter 6 Of Title 44 So As To Create An Ambulance Assessment Fee For Private Ambulance Services; To Require The South Carolina Department Of Health And Human Services To Establish And Charge Ambulance Services A Uniform Fee; To Establish An Ambulance Fee Trust Fund And To Provide For The Authorized Uses Of The Fund; To Allow The Department To Impose Penalties Against Ambulance Services That Fail To Pay Assessed Fees; And For Other Purposes.
Title
Ambulance Assessment
Sponsors
Rep. William Herbkersman [R] | Rep. William Sandifer [R] | Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. Marvin Smith [R] |
Rep. Roger Kirby [D] | Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 88 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 88 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-26 |
2024-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby |
2024-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith |
2024-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson |
2023-04-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sandifer |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |