SC H4243 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-39-250, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Adjustments In Valuation And Assessment For Purposes Of Ad Valorem Taxation, So As To Require An Adjustment For Damages Caused By Flooding Or A Hurricane.
Title
Property valuation adjustment
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Crawford [R] | Rep. Timothy McGinnis [R] | Rep. Kevin Hardee [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Johnson [R] |
Rep. Thomas Brittain [R] | Rep. David Weeks [D] | Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2022-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-06 | House | Amended |
2022-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley |
2022-04-05 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2021-04-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |