SC H4245 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 5 To Chapter 17, Title 47 So As To Provide It Is Unlawful To Advertise, Sell, Label, Or Misrepresent As "meat" Or "clean Meat" All Or Part Of A Carcass That Is Cell-cultured Meat/protein, Or Is Not Derived From Harvested Production Livestock, Poultry, Fish, Or Crustaceans, To Provide That This Provision Does Not Apply To Plant-based Meat Substitutes, And To Provide A Penalty. - Ratified Title
Title
Meat
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 1a (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Act No. 79 | |
2019-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/19 | |
2019-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Ratified R 99 | |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2019-05-09 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-04-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-04 | House | Amended |
2019-04-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2019-04-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19 |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder, V.S.Moss, D.C.Moss, B.Cox, Forrest, Simrill, Martin, B.Newton, Magnuson, Moore, Hyde, Simmons, Trantham, R.Williams, Jefferson, King, W.Cox |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |