SC H4538 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Scrivener's error corrected
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Scrivener's error corrected
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING CHAPTER 140 TO TITLE 44 SO AS TO ESTABLISH THE SOUTH CAROLINA HEALTH INFORMATION EXCHANGE (SCHIEX), TO ESTABLISH THE SOUTH CAROLINA HEALTH INFORMATION EXCHANGE COUNCIL AS THE GOVERNING BODY OF SCHIEX TO OVERSEE AND GOVERN THE EXCHANGE OF HEALTH-RELATED INFORMATION AMONG HEALTH CARE ORGANIZATIONS, TO PROVIDE FOR THE COUNCIL'S POWERS AND DUTIES, AND TO FURTHER PROVIDE FOR THE ELECTRONIC MOVEMENT OF HEALTH-RELATED INFORMATION AMONG HEALTH CARE ORGANIZATIONS IN THE STATE.
Title
Establish The South Carolina Health Information Exchange (schiex), To Establish The South Carolina Health Information Exchange Council As The Governing Body Of Schiex To Oversee And Govern The Exchange Of Health-related Information Among Health Care Organizations, To Provide For The Council's Powers And Duties, And To Further Provide For The Electronic Movement Of Health-related Information Among Health Care Organizations In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-05-11 | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Medical Affairs SJ-8 | |
2010-04-27 | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs SJ-8 | |
2010-04-27 | Introduced and read first time SJ-8 | |
2010-04-23 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-2 | |
2010-04-22 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-58 | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time HJ-48 | |
2010-04-22 | Amended HJ-48 | |
2010-04-22 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper | |
2010-04-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-04-15 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-19 | |
2010-04-15 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bedingfield, Anderson | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-38 | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced and read first time HJ-38 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4538&session=118 |