SC H4601 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Committee report: Favorable Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Committee report: Favorable Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 56-5-4100, Relating To Preventing Escape Of Materials Loaded On Vehicles And Cleaning The Highways Of Escaped Substances Or Cargo, So As To Incorporate The Provisions Of Section 56-5-4110 To Clarify The Exceptions For Transportation Of Certain Farm Products And Materials; And By Repealing Section 56-5-4110 Relating To The Requirements That Loads And Covers Must Be Firmly Attached.
Title
Transportation of farm products, exceptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2024-03-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-11-16 | House | Prefiled |