SC H4633 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 288
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 288
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Date By Which An Independent School Must Apply To Become An Eligible Institution For Purposes Of The Educational Tax Credit For Exceptional Needs Children Until May 1, 2016
Title
Educational Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Act No. 288 | |
2016-02-22 | Effective date 02/16/16 | |
2016-02-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-02-11 | Ratified R 139 | |
2016-02-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-01-14 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2016-01-13 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2016-01-13 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S0907 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Finance