SC H4820 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Gressette Room 307
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Gressette Room 308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Gressette Room 307
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Gressette Room 308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 50-11-580, Relating To The Season For Hunting And Taking Male Wild Turkeys, Bag Limits, Taking Female Wild Turkeys, And Annual Reporting, So As To Adjust The Hunting And Limit For Taking Male Wild Turkeys; And To Provide A Sunset Provision.
Title
Turkey season
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-8 |
2024-03-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-26 | House | Amended |
2024-03-21 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-03-20 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2024-02-27 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2024-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gibson |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |