SC H4892 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 03/11/24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 03/11/24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 510 Of 1982, As Amended, Relating To The Anderson County Board Of Education, So As To Reapportion The Districts From Which Board Members Are Elected; And To Amend Act 509 Of 1982, As Amended, Relating To The Election Of Trustees Of Anderson County School District 1, So As To Reapportion These Districts. - Ratified Title
Title
Anderson County Board of Education, districts reapportioned
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Thayer [R] | Rep. John West [R] | Rep. Don Chapman [R] | Rep. Thomas Beach [R] |
Rep. April Cromer [R] | Rep. Craig Gagnon [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Effective date 03/11/24 | |
2024-03-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-03-07 | Ratified R 128 | |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2024-01-31 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2024-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-30 | House | Amended |
2024-01-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-24 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Anderson Delegation |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Anderson Delegation |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |