SC H5014 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The One Percent Sales Tax Imposed By Act 378 Of 2004, As Amended, The Lexington County School District Property Tax Relief Act, For An Additional Seven Years.
Title
Lexington County School District Property Tax Relief Act extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2024-03-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-03-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2024-03-28 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-27 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Lexington Delegation |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Lexington Delegation |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |