SC H5179 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Direct The Department Of Education To Name The Converse School Bus Maintenance Shop In Spartanburg County The "david T. Brewington School Bus Maintenance Center", And To Direct The Department To Install Appropriate Signage Containing The Words "david T. Brewington School Bus Maintenance Center" As The Department Considers Advisable.
Title
David T. Brewington School Bus Maintenance Center
Sponsors
Rep. Travis Moore [R] | Rep. Max Hyde [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-04-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2024-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |