SC S0154 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Enacting The "south Carolina Street Gang And Criminal Enterprise Prevention And Anti-racketeering Act"; By Amending Article 3 Of Chapter 8, Title 16, Relating To The Criminal Gang Prevention Act, So As To Retitle The Article, Revise The Definitions For Purposes Of The Article, And Restructure The Article And The Offenses And Penalties Contained Within It; And By Adding Article 5 To Chapter 8, Title 16 So As To Create Anti-racketeering Provisions To Compliment The Revised Street Gang And Criminal Enterprise Prevention Article, Define Necessary Terms, And Create Various Racketeering Offenses And Establish Penalties For Violations.
Title
South Carolina Street Gang and Criminal Enterprise Prevention and Anti-Racketeering Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-04-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rice, Senn, Adams, Tedder |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3003 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary