SC S0173 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 59-119-170 So As To Provide That All Regulations Promulgated By The Division Of Regulatory And Public Service Programs Must Be Promulgated In Accordance With The Administrative Procedures Act; And To Amend Sections 46-1-140, 46-9-50, 46-10-30, 46-13-30, 46-23-90, 46-25-40, 46-25-45, 46-26-160, 46-35-10, 46-37-20, And 46-37-25 To Conform To The Requirement That All Regulations Promulgated By The Division Of Regulatory And Public Service Programs Must Be Promulgated In Accordance With The Administrative Procedures Act.
Title
Clemson University
Sponsors
Sen. Wes Climer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2023-02-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 1 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 10 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 13 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 23 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 25 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 25 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 26 | 160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 35 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 37 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 37 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 9 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 119 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |