SC S0410 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 03/11/24
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 03/11/24
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Convey The Real Property Of The Fairmont-larkin Area Recreation Commission To Spartanburg County; To Dissolve The Fairmont-larkin Area Recreation Commission; And To Repeal Act 819 Of 1978, Relating To The Creation And Duties Of The Fairmont-larkin Area Recreation Commission. - Ratified Title
Title
Fairmont-Larkin Area Recreation Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Effective date 03/11/24 | |
2024-03-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-03-07 | Ratified R 114 | |
2024-01-31 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-01-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2024-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-25 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-01-24 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Spartanburg Delegation |
2023-01-26 | House | Referred to Spartanburg Delegation |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |