SC S0424 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-3530, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Community Development Tax Credits, So As To Allow A Tax Credit Of Fifty Percent Of Any Cash Donation To A Community Development Corporation Or Community Development Financial Institutions, To Delete An Aggregate Credit Provision And Set An Annual Limit, To Establish Tax Credit Reserve Accounts For The First Three Quarters Of Each Tax Year So As To Avoid The Depletion Of Credits By An Individual Taxpayer, To Delete The Pro-rata Distribution Of Tax Credits, To Allow Financial Institutions With Tax Liabilities In This State To Invest In Community Development Corporations For The Purpose Of Receiving A Tax Credit, And To Provide That Returns On Investments In Certified Community Development Corporations And Certified Community Development Financial Institutions May Not Exceed The Total Amount Of The Initial Investment; And To Amend Section 4 Of Act 314 Of 2000, As Amended, Relating To Community Development Corporations And Financial Institutions, So As To Extend The Provisions Of The South Carolina Community Economic Development Act Until June 30, 2023.
Title
Community development tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4133 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Act No. 77
S0879 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0879 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0424&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/424_20190124.htm |