SC S0455 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-24
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-24
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 44-29-230, Relating To Testing Required When A Health Care Worker Is Exposed To Bloodborne Disease, So As To Replace References To Physician With Health Care Professionals, To Include Dentists In The Definition Of Health Care Professionals, And To Add Hepatitis C To The List Of Bloodborne Diseases.
Title
Bloodborne Disease
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-24 |
2024-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-03-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |