SC S0558 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-24
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-24
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 44-31-40 So As To Provide The Procedure For The Tuberculosis Testing Of Applicant Residents And Newly Admitted Residents Of Nursing Homes In This State.
Title
TB Test & Admission to Nursing Home
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-24 |
2024-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-02-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |