SC S0595 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaim May 16, 2013, As Senior Hunger Awareness Day In South Carolina, And To Encourage All South Carolinians To Learn More About The Impact Of Hunger And Malnutrition On The Health Of Our Citizens And The Progress Of Our State And To Work Together For A Hunger-free South Carolina.
Title
Senior Hunger Awareness Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Introduced |