SC S0940 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 290
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 290
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Referendum For Reimposition Must Not Be Held Earlier Than Within The Calendar Year Which Is Two Years Before The Calendar Year In Which The Tax In Effect Is Scheduled To Terminate
Title
Capital improvement sales and use tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under Rule15a (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under 15a (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: To Table The Motion Under Rule 14 To Carry Over With Senator Retaining The Floor (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under Rule 15a (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under 15a (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under Rule 15a (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under Rule 15a (Y: 9 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-17 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under Rule15a (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under 15a (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: To Table The Motion Under Rule 14 To Carry Over With Senator Retaining The Floor (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under Rule 15a (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under 15a (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under Rule 15a (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion Under Rule 15a (Y: 9 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-17 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Act No. 290 | |
2014-07-08 | Effective date 06/24/14 | |
2014-06-24 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-20 | Ratified R 324 | |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-5 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Conference report adopted |
2014-06-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2014-06-17 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Setzler, O'Dell, Young |
2014-06-03 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. JR Smith, White, Clyburn |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2014-05-23 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2014-05-22 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2014-05-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-2 |
2014-05-22 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-22 | House | Amended |
2014-05-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-9 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4512 (Similar To) 2014-01-16 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means