SC S0988 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize American Legion Auxiliary Palmetto Girls State To Use The Chambers Of The South Carolina Senate And House Of Representatives On Friday, June 14, 2024.
Title
Palmetto Girls State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2024-04-09 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-03-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Operations and Management |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Operations and Management |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced |