SC S1126 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Debate adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Debate adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Amendment To Section 4, Article Ii Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, Relating To Voter Qualifications, So As To Clarify That Only A Citizen Of The United States And Of This State Of The Age Of Eighteen And Upwards Who Is Properly Registered Is Entitled To Vote As Provided By Law.
Title
Constitutional amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-04-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-04-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-3 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-03-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Hutto, Malloy, Garrett, Kimbrell |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H5081 (Similar To) 2024-02-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hiott