SC S1296 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 299
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 299
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide The Kershaw County Transportation Committee Shall Be Comprised Of Seven Members; And To Provide Members Shall Serve Terms Of Four Years, Except That On The Effective Date Of This Act Members Shall Serve Initial Terms That Are Staggered In Two, Three, And Four-year Intervals
Title
Kershaw County Transportation Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 39) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Act No. 299 | |
2016-06-16 | Effective date 06/05/16 | |
2016-06-05 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 248 | |
2016-05-27 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-05-26 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2016-05-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-78 Nays-0 |
2016-05-26 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Kershaw Delegation |
2016-05-18 | House | Referred to Kershaw Delegation |
2016-05-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |