SC S1428 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-06 - Referred to Committee on Education SJ-6
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Status: Introduced on May 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-06 - Referred to Committee on Education SJ-6
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO PROVIDE THAT THE SCHOOL DAY MISSED ON APRIL 26, 2010, BY THE STUDENTS OF DARLINGTON COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT WHEN THE SCHOOLS WERE CLOSED DUE TO A TORNADO IS EXEMPT FROM THE MAKE-UP REQUIREMENT THAT FULL SCHOOL DAYS MISSED DUE TO SNOW, EXTREME WEATHER, OR OTHER DISRUPTIONS BE MADE UP.
Title
Provide That The School Day Missed On April 26, 2010, By The Students Of Darlington County School District When The Schools Were Closed Due To A Tornado Is Exempt From The Make-up Requirement That Full School Days Missed Due To Snow, Extreme Weather, Or Other Disruptions Be Made Up.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | Referred to Committee on Education SJ-6 | |
2010-05-06 | Introduced and read first time SJ-6 |
Same As/Similar To
H4916 (Similar To) 2010-09-09 - Act No. 304
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1428&session=118 |