SC S783 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Act No. 281
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Act No. 281
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND SECTION 51-13-720, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO MEMBERS OF THE GOVERNING BOARD OF THE PATRIOTS POINT DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY, SO AS TO PROVIDE FOR THREE ADDITIONAL MEMBERS OF THE BOARD AND THE MANNER OF THEIR TERMS AND APPOINTMENT. - ratified title
Title
Provide For Three Additional Members Of The Board And The Manner Of Their Terms And Appointment. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-14 | Act No. 281 | |
2010-07-13 | Effective date 06/16/10 | |
2010-06-16 | Veto overridden Yeas-103 Nays-1 HJ-406 | |
2010-06-16 | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-36 Nays-6 SJ-34 | |
2010-06-11 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-06-07 | Ratified R 303 | |
2010-06-03 | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 HJ-15 | |
2010-06-03 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-15 | |
2010-06-02 | Returned to House with amendments SJ-195 | |
2010-06-02 | House amendment amended SJ-195 | |
2010-05-19 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-11 | |
2010-05-18 | Read second time HJ-179 | |
2010-05-18 | Amended HJ-179 | |
2010-05-12 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary HJ-6 | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-02-11 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-15 | |
2010-02-10 | Read second time SJ-10 | |
2010-02-10 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-10 | |
2010-02-09 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry SJ-14 | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry SJ-7 | |
2009-05-05 | Introduced and read first time SJ-7 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=783&session=118 |