SC S850 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Act No. 274
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Act No. 274
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND SECTION 12-6-5060, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE DESIGNATION ON A STATE INDIVIDUAL INCOME TAX RETURN OF A VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTION BY THE TAXPAYER TO CERTAIN FUNDS, SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT A TAXPAYER MAY CONTRIBUTE TO THE SOUTH CAROLINA FORESTRY COMMISSION FOR USE IN THE STATE FOREST SYSTEM AND TO THE SOUTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES FOR USE IN ITS PROGRAMS AND OPERATIONS; AND TO AMEND SECTION 12-54-250, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE AUTHORITY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE TO REQUIRE PAYMENT WITH IMMEDIATELY AVAILABLE FUNDS, SO AS TO DELETE PROVISIONS RELATING TO SIMULTANEOUS ACTS FOR PURPOSES OF INTEREST AND PENALTIES. - ratified title
Title
Delete Provisions Relating To Simultaneous Acts For Purposes Of Interest And Penalties. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
Sen. John McGill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-14 | Act No. 274 | |
2010-07-13 | Effective date 06/16/10 | |
2010-06-17 | Veto overridden Yeas-103 Nays-1 HJ-414 | |
2010-06-16 | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-32 Nays-9 SJ-38 | |
2010-06-07 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Ratified R 254 | |
2010-05-27 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled SJ-76 | |
2010-05-26 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-12 | |
2010-05-25 | Read second time HJ-41 | |
2010-05-25 | Amended HJ-41 | |
2010-05-19 | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means HJ-47 | |
2010-03-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-4 | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced and read first time HJ-4 | |
2010-03-10 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-18 | |
2010-03-10 | Amended SJ-18 | |
2010-03-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-04 | Read second time SJ-11 | |
2010-03-03 | Committee report: Favorable Finance SJ-9 | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-6 | |
2009-05-19 | Introduced and read first time SJ-6 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=850&session=118 |