SD HB1016 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Conduct a feasibility study on the medicaid program of all-inclusive care for the elderly and make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Conduct a feasibility study on the medicaid program of all-inclusive care for the elderly and make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Joint - Tabled (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Referred as Amended to (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Referred as Amended to (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-18 | House | Health and Human Services Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-18 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1016B |
2024-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-01-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 18 |