SD HB1029 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the Department of Health to fund the rural residency program and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the Department of Health to fund the rural residency program and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 860 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 551 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 525 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 524 |
2016-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 755 |
2016-03-01 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1. H.J. 730 |
2016-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 62 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 36 |
2016-01-12 | House | First Reading House H.J. 20 |