SD HB1038 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain family physicians, dentists, and physician assistants who have complied with the requirements of the recruitment assistance program.
Title
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain family physicians, dentists, and physician assistants who have complied with the requirements of the recruitment assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 761 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 597 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 615 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 560 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 568 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 542 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 247 |
2013-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 196 |
2013-01-24 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 165 |
2013-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 27 |