SD HB1039 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal certain outdated and unnecessary provisions regarding certain child support obligations and medical services to the indigent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal certain outdated and unnecessary provisions regarding certain child support obligations and medical services to the indigent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15SenateSigned by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470
2018-02-12SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 12, 2018 H.J. 403
2018-02-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 422
2018-02-07SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 382
2018-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 372
2018-02-02SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-02-02SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 342
2018-02-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 178
2018-01-19HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 0. H.J. 116
2018-01-18HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-01-18HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 88
2018-01-18HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-09HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 24

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1039&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1039P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1039ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24573&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24670&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24573&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24670&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25268&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25342&Session=2018

Bill Comments

feedback