SD HB1061 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for a court order to test for HIV at the request of victims of certain crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for a court order to test for HIV at the request of victims of certain crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
2019-03-05SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019 H.J. 626
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the President S.J. 600
2019-02-28SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 593
2019-02-27SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 540
2019-02-26SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 519
2019-02-26SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-11SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 331
2019-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 345
2019-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 345 Amendment 1061oa
2019-02-06HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 305
2019-02-06HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1061wa
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 158

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback