SD HB1062 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify the supporting documentation necessary for a request to implement the standard visitation guidelines.
Title
Clarify the supporting documentation necessary for a request to implement the standard visitation guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Signed by Governor H.J. 594 | |
2012-02-22 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 513 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 442 | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 402 | |
2012-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 178 | |
2012-01-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 188 | |
2012-01-23 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 167 | |
2012-01-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-19 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 54 |