SD HB1062 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 17, 2017 H.J. 424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 17, 2017 H.J. 424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to fund tax refunds for elderly persons and persons with a disability and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to fund tax refunds for elderly persons and persons with a disability and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 17, 2017 H.J. 424 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 15, 2017 H.J. 410 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 387 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 379 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 363 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 341 |
2017-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 333 |
2017-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 314 |
2017-02-03 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 288 |
2017-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-20 | House | First read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 97 |