SD HB1070 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 651
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 651
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the failure to fulfill the responsibilities of jury duty.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the failure to fulfill the responsibilities of jury duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 651 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 570 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 509 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 4. S.J. 534 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 514 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 477 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 439 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 420 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 399 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 355 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 201 |
2013-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 142 |
2013-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 142 Amendment 1070ra |
2013-01-18 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 107 |
2013-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-16 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 82 |