SD HB1073 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Keep interest earned on incarceration construction fund moneys in the same fund.
Title
Keep interest earned on incarceration construction fund moneys in the same fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 H.J. 364 |
2024-02-15 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 15, 2024 H.J. 340 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 330 |
2024-02-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 322 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 299 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 286 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 279 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 129 |
2024-01-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 95 |
2024-01-18 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-18 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-12 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 50 |
2024-01-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested H.J. 37 |
2024-01-11 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 37 |