SD HB1079 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions related to the purchase of firearms by out-of-state residents.
Title
Repeal certain provisions related to the purchase of firearms by out-of-state residents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 688 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 706 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 647 | |
2011-03-07 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-03-07 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 621 | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-03-02 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 499 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 475 | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454 | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-16 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 415 | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to House Judiciary, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 260 | |
2011-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 138 |