SD HB1080 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain requirements to qualify for emblem specialty plates for motor vehicles.
Title
Revise certain requirements to qualify for emblem specialty plates for motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 H.J. 470 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2018 H.J. 403 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 422 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 382 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 369 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 342 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 249 |
2018-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 187 |
2018-01-23 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 142 |
2018-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-16 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 65 |