SD HB1109 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - House Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exclude certain funds from the calculation of local effort in the state aid to education formula.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exclude certain funds from the calculation of local effort in the state aid to education formula.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 446
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-08HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 345
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 343
2019-02-08HouseFiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 343
2019-02-06HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 5. H.J. 321
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 193

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback